House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 11:35 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 22, Noes 10 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 adopted | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Read a second time | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Placed at the foot of the calendar of 2-20-2024 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 5, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Representative Duchow added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | Introduced |