Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Published 3-23-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-22-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 192
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Action ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kitchens
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:59 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|