Wisconsin 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Senate Bill SB990 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Wisconsin Legislative Council 
ACT MEMO 
One Ea st Ma in Stre e t, Suite 401 • Ma dison, W I 53703 • (608) 266-1304 • le g.council@le gis.wisconsin.gov • http://www.le gis.wisconsin.gov/lc 
Prepared by: Emily Hicks, Staff Attorney 	March 27, 2024 
2023 Wisconsin Act 192 
[2023 Senate Bill 990] 
Early Literacy Professional 
Development and Reading 
Readiness Assessments 
EARLY LITERACY PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT 
2023 Wisconsin Act 20, relating to early literacy instruction, curriculum, and assessments, requires 
certain public school staff and University of Wisconsin System faculty to receive professional 
development training in science-based early reading instruction offered by particular providers. 
Under 2023 Wisconsin Act 192, certain trainings offered by cooperative educational service agencies 
(CESAs) satisfy the Act 20 professional development training requirement. Specifically, CESA-provided 
training must: (1) have been provided by CESA 6, 8, or 9; (2) have been provided after May 1, 2021 and 
before July 1, 2024; and (3) be on science-based early reading instruction. 
ASSESSMENTS AND PERSONALIZED READING PLANS 
Screening Assessments 
Beginning with the 2024-25 school year, 2023 Wisconsin Act 20 requires traditional public schools and 
independent charter schools (collectively “public schools”) to administer fundamental skills screening 
assessments to students in four-year-old kindergarten (4K) at least twice each year, with the first 
assessment administered within 45 days of the beginning of the school year and the second assessment 
at least 45 days before the end of the school year. Act 20 also requires public schools to administer a 
universal screening assessment to all students in five-year-old kindergarten (5K) through third grade at 
least three times each year, with the initial assessment administered within the first 45 days of the 
school year, the second administered in the middle of the school year, and the third administered at 
least 45 days before the end of the school year. 
2023 Wisconsin Act 192 alters these requirements for the 2024-25 school year. Specifically, in the 
2024-25 school year, public schools are required to administer the 4K fundamental skills reading 
assessment only once, between January 1, 2025 and 45 days before the end of the school year. 
Additionally, under the act, during the 2024-25 school year, public schools are required to administer 
universal screenings for 5K to third grade students only twice: once in the middle of the school term and 
again at least 45 days before the end of the school year. 
Diagnostic Assessments 
Act 20 also requires public schools to administer a diagnostic assessment to any student whose score on 
a universal screening assessment is below the 25
th
 percentile, indicating that the student is “at-risk.” 
Under Act 20, a public school must administer a diagnostic assessment to a student by the second 
Friday of November if the first universal screening of the school year indicates the student is at-risk, or 
within 10 days if a mid-year universal screening indicates the student is at-risk. A public school must  - 2 - 
also administer a diagnostic assessment within 20 days after a teacher or parent who suspects a student 
has characteristics of dyslexia submits a request for the assessment. 
Act 192 alters this requirement for the 2024-25 school year to remove the requirement for a diagnostic 
assessment by the second Friday of November if the first universal screening of the school year 
indicates the student is at-risk. Additionally, under Act 192, the requirement to administer a diagnostic 
assessment within 20 days of a teacher or parent’s request does not go into effect until January 1, 2025. 
Personalized Reading Plans 
Act 20 requires schools to create a personalized reading plan for a student within 10 days of that 
student scoring below the 25
th
 percentile on either a universal screening or diagnostic assessment. 
Under Act 192, this requirement first applies after assessments administered in the middle or at the end 
of the 2024-25 school year. 
Effective date: March 24, 2024 
For a full history of the bill, visit the Legislature’s bill history page. 
EH:kp;jal