Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Introduced |