House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Read and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Introduced |