Senate | 02/28/2024 | Report correctly enrolled | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Received from Assembly concurred in | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Concurred in | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Received from Senate | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Introduced |