Senate | 02/19/2024 | Report correctly enrolled | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Concurred in | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Read and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Introduced |