Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Concurred in, Ayes 63, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Adopted, Ayes 21, Noes 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 22, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Pfaff, Agard, Hesselbein, Carpenter, L. Johnson, Larson, Roys, Smith, Spreitzer and Wirch
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Representatives Brandtjen, Allen and Schraa added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|