Senate | 05/01/2024 | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 13 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 3-6-2024 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Report correctly enrolled | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Concurred in | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Representative Moore Omokunde added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-22-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Introduced |