Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Senator James added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Introduced |