Senate | 02/09/2024 | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 7 | ||
Senate | 11/28/2023 | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 11-28-2023 | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Report correctly enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Received from Assembly concurred in | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Representative Macco added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Concurred in | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Placed on calendar 4-18-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Read and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Senator Cowles added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Introduced |