Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Published 5-11-2023. Enrolled Joint Resolution 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 1-19-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 74, Noes 23
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Refused to refer to committee on Judiciary, Ayes 35, Noes 62
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Placed on calendar 1-19-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Read a third time and adopted, Ayes 23, Noes 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Rules suspended to give joint resolution its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2023
|
Placed on calendar 1-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Report adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2023
|
Representatives Brooks and Donovan added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2023
|
Senator Felzkowski added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|