House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Read and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Placed on calendar 4-19-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Introduced |