Senate | 01/23/2023 | Report correctly enrolled | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Received from Assembly concurred in | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Concurred in | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Placed on calendar 1-19-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Read and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 01/13/2023 | Placed on calendar 1-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Introduced |