Senate | 05/01/2023 | Report correctly enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Received from Assembly concurred in | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Representatives Clancy and Madison added as cosponsors | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Concurred in | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Read | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Representative Vining added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Placed on calendar 4-19-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Senator Felzkowski added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Introduced |