Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Published 4-29-2024. Enrolled Joint Resolution 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 3-6-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 63, Noes 33
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:02 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Read a third time and adopted, Ayes 21, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Rules suspended to give joint resolution its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2023
|
Report adoption recommended by Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|