Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 10/27/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Representative Billings added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/22/2023 | Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/12/2023 | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/29/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/18/2023 | Representative Snodgrass added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/15/2023 | Representative Clancy added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/09/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 08/09/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 08/09/2023 | Introduced |