Senate | 01/30/2024 | Report correctly enrolled | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Received from Assembly concurred in | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Concurred in | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:34 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Read and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Senator Roys added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 10/16/2023 | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 09/29/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 09/29/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 09/29/2023 | Introduced |