Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Published 2-9-2024. Enrolled Joint Resolution 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/28/2023
|
Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 11-28-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2023
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 60, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-9-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Read a third time and adopted, Ayes 21, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Rules suspended to give joint resolution its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Report adoption recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|