Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 11/14/2023 | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Representatives Madison and Clancy added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Senator Felzkowski added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 10/16/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 10/16/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 10/16/2023 | Introduced |