Senate | 11/13/2023 | Report correctly enrolled | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Received from Assembly concurred in | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Concurred in, Ayes 95, Noes 4 | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Read | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Adopted, Ayes 31, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 11/03/2023 | Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Introduced |