House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Read and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Introduced |