Senate | 05/01/2024 | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 12 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 3-6-2024 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Report correctly enrolled | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Received from Assembly concurred in | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Representative Vining added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Concurred in | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Read and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Adopted by unanimous rising vote | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Read | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Representative Brandtjen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Introduced |