House | 05/13/2025 | Representative McCarville added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0 | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Representative Miresse added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Introduced |