House | 05/15/2025 | Representative Tittl added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/14/2025 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative O'Connor | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives O'Connor, Maxey and Donovan | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Introduced |