House | 05/21/2025 | Representatives Udell, Subeck, Miresse and J. Jacobson added as coauthors | ||
House | 05/21/2025 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 05/20/2025 | Representative Bare added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/19/2025 | Representatives DeSmidt, Emerson and Snodgrass added as coauthors | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Introduced |