LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Wisconsin WI
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
House
Bills
AB242
Action History
WI
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AB242
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Wisconsin 2025-2026 Regular Session
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AB242
Action History
House
05/21/2025
Executive action taken
House
05/15/2025
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Summerfield
House
05/12/2025
Senator Ratcliff added as a cosponsor
House
05/07/2025
Public hearing held
House
05/02/2025
Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
House
05/02/2025
Introduced