House | 05/20/2025 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/19/2025 | Representative Clancy added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/15/2025 | Representative Vining added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/14/2025 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/14/2025 | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/13/2025 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 05/13/2025 | Representative McCarville added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/13/2025 | Senator Jacque added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 05/12/2025 | Representatives Donovan and Palmeri added as coauthors | ||
House | 05/12/2025 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 05/12/2025 | Introduced |