Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Representative Brooks added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Franklin and Spiros
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Representative Miresse added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Representative Prado added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Referred to calendar of 3-13-2025 pursuant to Assembly Rule 45 (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 3
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Franklin
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Introduced
|
|
|