Senate | 05/15/2025 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | LRB correction | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Read a third time and passed | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Read a second time | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Representatives Stroud, Stubbs and Joers added as coauthors | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Placed on calendar 3-18-2025 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 10, Noes 0 | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Representative Miresse added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Representative Vining added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Senator Jacque added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Introduced |