House
|
05/20/2025
|
Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 3-24-2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Report correctly enrolled on 3-21-2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Bradley, Felzkowski, Feyen, Jagler, James, Kapenga, LeMahieu, Marklein, Nass, Stafsholt, Testin, Tomczyk, Wanggaard and Wimberger of the Senate added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Concurred in by unanimous rising vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Rules suspended and taken up
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Placed on calendar 3-18-2025 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Representative Melotik added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Placed on calendar 3-18-2025 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Read and referred to Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Introduced
|
|
|