House | 05/16/2025 | Report correctly enrolled on 5-16-2025 | ||
House | 05/15/2025 | Received from Senate concurred in | ||
Senate | 05/15/2025 | Concurred in | ||
Senate | 05/15/2025 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 05/13/2025 | Placed on calendar 5-15-2025 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 05/13/2025 | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 05/13/2025 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 05/13/2025 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/13/2025 | Representative Miresse added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/09/2025 | Withdrawn from committee on Rules and referred to calendar of 5-13-2025 | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Introduced |