House | 05/19/2025 | Report correctly enrolled on 5-16-2025 | ||
House | 05/15/2025 | Received from Senate concurred in | ||
Senate | 05/15/2025 | Concurred in | ||
Senate | 05/15/2025 | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and taken up | ||
Senate | 05/15/2025 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 05/14/2025 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 05/14/2025 | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 05/13/2025 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 05/13/2025 | Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/13/2025 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/12/2025 | Representative Vining added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/09/2025 | Withdrawn from committee on Rules and referred to calendar of 5-13-2025 | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Introduced |