House | 04/22/2025 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Read a third time and passed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Read a second time | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 04/18/2025 | Placed on calendar 4-22-2025 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources, Veteran and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Senator Habush Sinykin added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Representative Tusler added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Veteran and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Introduced |