LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Wisconsin WI
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB222
Action History
WI
Wisconsin Senate Bill SB222
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Wisconsin 2025-2026 Regular Session
Wisconsin Senate Bill SB222
Action History
Senate
05/21/2025
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator James
Senate
05/07/2025
Representative Udell added as a cosponsor
Senate
05/06/2025
Senator Ratcliff added as a coauthor
Senate
04/28/2025
Senator Smith added as a coauthor
Senate
04/25/2025
Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
Senate
04/25/2025
Introduced