Senate | 05/23/2025 | Representative Subeck withdrawn as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/22/2025 | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/21/2025 | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/20/2025 | Senator James added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 05/20/2025 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 05/15/2025 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities and Tourism | ||
Senate | 05/15/2025 | Introduced |