House
|
05/01/2023
|
Chapter 188, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Approved by Governor 3/28/2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
To Governor 3/22/2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor 3/28/2023 - House Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor 3/28/2023 - Senate Journal
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2023
|
To Governor 3/22/2023 - House Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2023
|
To Governor 3/22/2023 - Senate Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
House Message received
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Completed legislative action
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 581)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House received Senate message
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Communicated to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate requests House to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Passed Senate (Roll No. 425)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
On 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
On 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Reported do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Immediate consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
To Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
To Health and Human Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Introduced in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
To Health and Human Resources then Finance
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Passed House (Roll No. 90)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Amendment rejected (Roll No. 89)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Amendment rejected (Roll No. 88)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
By substitute, do pass
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2023
|
To House Finance
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2023
|
With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
To House Health and Human Resources
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Filed for introduction
|
|
|