House
|
05/01/2023
|
Chapter 62, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Approved by Governor 2/13/2023 - House Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Approved by Governor 2/13/2023 - Senate Journal
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Approved by Governor 2/13/2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
To Governor 2/7/2023 - House Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
To Governor 2/7/2023 - Senate Journal
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
To Governor 2/7/2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
House received Senate message
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Completed legislative action
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Communicated to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Effective from passage (Roll No. 119)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Passed Senate (Roll No. 119)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
On 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
On 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
On 1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Reported do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
To Health and Human Resources
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Communicated to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Effective from passage (Roll No. 14)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Passed House (Roll No. 13)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
On 1st reading, Special Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2023
|
By substitute, do pass
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
To House Health and Human Resources
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
Filed for introduction
|
|
|