House
|
05/01/2023
|
Chapter 322, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Approved by Governor 3/8/2023 - House Journal
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Approved by Governor 3/8/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Approved by Governor 3/8/2023 - Senate Journal
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
To Governor 3/2/2023 - House Journal
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
To Governor 3/2/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
To Governor 3/2/2023 - Senate Journal
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House received Senate message
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Completed legislative action
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Communicated to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Passed Senate (Roll No. 303)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
On 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2023
|
On 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
On 1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Reported do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
To Outdoor Recreation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Communicated to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Passed House (Roll No. 164)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Immediate consideration
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
By substitute, do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
To House Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Do pass, but first to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
Filed for introduction
|
|
|