House
|
05/01/2023
|
Chapter 56, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Approved by Governor 3/29/2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
To Governor 3/20/2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - Senate Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2023
|
To Governor 3/20/2023 - Senate Journal
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2023
|
To Governor 3/20/2023 - House Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
House Message received
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Completed legislative action
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 582)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House received Senate message
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Communicated to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate requests House to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 400)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Laid over on 3rd reading 3/6/2023 with right to amend
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
On 3rd reading with right to amend
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
On 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
On 1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Introduced in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
To Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Passed House (Roll No. 45)
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
On 1st reading, Special Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
By substitute, do pass
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
To House Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
Filed for introduction
|
|
|