Senate | 02/28/2023 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Finance | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Introduced in Senate | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Communicated to Senate | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Passed House (Roll No. 290) | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | ||
House | 02/25/2023 | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) | ||
House | 02/25/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 02/25/2023 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Read 1st time | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | On 1st reading, Special Calendar | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | By substitute, do pass | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | To House Government Organization | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Do pass, but first to Government Organization | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | To House Technology and Infrastructure | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | Introduced in House | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | To Technology and Infrastructure then Government Organization | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | Filed for introduction |