House
|
05/01/2023
|
Chapter 133, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Approved by Governor 3/29/2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
To Governor 3/21/2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - Senate Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2023
|
To Governor 3/21/2023 - Senate Journal
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2023
|
To Governor 3/21/2023 - House Journal
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House received Senate message
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Completed legislative action
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Communicated to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Committee title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent (Voice vote)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Senate (Roll No. 416)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Deferred until foot of 1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
On 3rd reading with right to amend
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
On 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
On 1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Introduced in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
To Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Communicated to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Passed House (Roll No. 73)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
On 1st reading, Special Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
By substitute, do pass
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
To House Education
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
Filed for introduction
|
|
|