House | 03/02/2023 | To House Government Organization | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | To Government Organization then Finance | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Introduced in House | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Ordered to House | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 329) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | On 3rd reading | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | On 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Immediate consideration | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance | ||
Senate | 01/13/2023 | Introduced in Senate | ||
Senate | 01/13/2023 | To Government Organization | ||
Senate | 01/13/2023 | Filed for introduction |