Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Chapter 219, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Approved by Governor 3/28/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
To Governor 3/16/2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor 3/28/2023 - House Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor 3/28/2023 - Senate Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2023
|
To Governor 3/16/2023 - Senate Journal
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2023
|
To Governor 3/16/2023 - House Journal
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2023
|
House received Senate message
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2023
|
Completed legislative action
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2023
|
Communicated to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2023
|
Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 577)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2023
|
House Message received
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Communicated to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Passed House (Roll No. 640)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Immediate consideration
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
With amendment, do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Read 1st time
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
To House Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Do pass, but first to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Ordered to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 62)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
On 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Laid over on 2nd reading 1/19/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
On 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
On 1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Committee substitute reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2023
|
Introduced in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2023
|
To Agriculture and Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2023
|
Filed for introduction
|
|
|