House | 01/30/2023 | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Government Organization | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Introduced in House | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Ordered to House | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 79) | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | On 3rd reading | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | On 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | On 1st reading | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Committee substitute reported | ||
Senate | 01/13/2023 | Introduced in Senate | ||
Senate | 01/13/2023 | To Agriculture and Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 01/13/2023 | Filed for introduction |