Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Chapter 81, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Approved by Governor 3/15/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
To Governor 3/15/2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor 3/15/2023 - House Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor 3/15/2023 - Senate Journal
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2023
|
To Governor 3/15/2023 - House Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2023
|
To Governor 3/15/2023 - Senate Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
House Message received
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Completed legislative action
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Communicated to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed House (Roll No. 596)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
On 1st reading, Special Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Read 1st time
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
To House Finance
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
To Finance
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
Ordered to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
Passed Senate (Roll No. 125)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
On 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
On 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
On 1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
2nd reference dispensed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
To Government Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Introduced in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
To Government Organization then Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Filed for introduction
|
|
|