House
|
04/14/2025
|
Approved by Governor 4/12/2025
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2025
|
Approved by Governor 4/14/2025 - House Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2025
|
Approved by Governor 4/12/2025 - Senate Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
To Governor 4/7/2025 - House Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
To Governor 4/7/2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
To Governor 4/7/2025 - Senate Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
House Message received
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Completed legislative action
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 380)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
House received Senate message
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Communicated to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Senate requests House to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Title amendment adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Passed Senate (Roll No. 303)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
On 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Laid over on 2nd reading 4/1/2025, com. amends pending
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
On 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Immediate consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Reported do pass, with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Introduced in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
To Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Passed House (Roll No. 88)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
On 1st reading, Special Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
By substitute, do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
To House Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
To House Public Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Filed for introduction
|
|
|