House | 03/21/2025 | Approved by Governor 3/21/2025 - House Journal | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Approved by Governor 3/20/2025 - Senate Journal | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Approved by Governor 3/20/2025 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | To Governor 3/14/2025 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | House Message received | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Completed legislative action | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Communicated to Senate | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 61) | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Passed House (Roll No. 60) | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | On 1st reading, Special Calendar | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Read 1st time | ||
House | 03/07/2025 | Do pass | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Markup Discussion | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | To House Energy and Public Works | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | To Energy and Public Works | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Introduced in House | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | House received Senate message | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Ordered to House | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 36) | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 35) | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | On 3rd reading | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | On 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | On 1st reading | ||
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Committee substitute reported | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Introduced in Senate | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | To Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Filed for introduction |