House | 03/19/2025 | To House Finance | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | To FinanceJudiciary | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Introduced in House | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | House received Senate message | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Ordered to House | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 102) | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 101) | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | On 3rd reading | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | On 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | On 1st reading | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Reported do pass | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Introduced in Senate | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | To Finance | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Filed for introduction |