House | 03/31/2025 | To House Finance | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Introduced in House | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | House received Senate message | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | To Finance | ||
Senate | 03/29/2025 | Ordered to House | ||
Senate | 03/29/2025 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 227) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 03/29/2025 | On 3rd reading | ||
Senate | 03/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 03/28/2025 | On 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Immediate consideration | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Committee substitute reported | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Introduced in Senate | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Filed for introduction |